U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-00390
  • Case Name: Hauck v. Putnam City Independent School District I001
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 05, 2022: [Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.