U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00886
  • Case Name: Southwest Maintenance and Supply Corp v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.