U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00911
  • Case Name: B&B Texas Equipment LLC v. Mckee et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 04, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 03, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Default]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • November 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.