U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00924
  • Case Name: Christy v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 16, 2023: [Strike]
  • January 13, 2023: [Surreply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Remand]
  • November 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.