U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00967
  • Case Name: Post et al v. Christian et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2022: [Declaration]
  • November 23, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • November 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.