U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00975
  • Case Name: Clouston v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 23, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.