U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00990
  • Case Name: Galt Landscape LLC v. Bank of America Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • January 05, 2023: [Substitute Party]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2022: [Compel]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Receipt]
  • November 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.