U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00999
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Oklahoma CPA Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Receipt]
  • November 22, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • November 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.