U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00992
  • Case Name: Jane Does 1-13 and 15-17 et al v. Mount Saint Mary High School Corporation of the State of Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order of Recusal]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 22, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.