U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01049
  • Case Name: Shirley v. Harpe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 05, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 05, 2023: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 04, 2023: [Receipt]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 14, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • December 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.