U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-01091
  • Case Name: McClain et al v. Hughey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 18, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.