U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Jenks et al v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 09, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 06, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 04, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.