U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Long v. Gourley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Compel]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.