U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00425-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waive and File Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.