U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00266-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bloom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 30, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.