U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Childers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Letter - Record Sent to USCA]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Appeal Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appeal Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 26, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • March 12, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 12, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • February 08, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • February 06, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2024
  • November 24, 2024: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.