U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 29, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2024: [Extension of Time]
November, 2024
  • November 06, 2024: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.