U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00406-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Lavarnway et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amended Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver (other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [DPPA-Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2024: [Appearance Bond]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 03, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.