U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00094-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Sawyer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript Request]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 17, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 16, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 01, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Supplement]
  • October 03, 2024: [New Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.