U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00614
  • Case Name: Bryant et al v. Tinker Federal Credit Union
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.