U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00402-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soudry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order for Response]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 14, 2025: [Docket]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.