U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00257
  • Case Name: Baylor v. Unknown Officers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 15, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 15, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 13, 2024: [Alter Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Exhibit List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.