U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Andino v. Hobbs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.