U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00397-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fraley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 30, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.