U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00835
  • Case Name: Coulter v. Butler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 16, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 07, 2025: [Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • March 31, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.