U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00397
  • Case Name: Agha et al v. Kay County Oklahoma Hospital Company LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 03, 2025: [Docket]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Bankruptcy]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.