U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00871
  • Case Name: Athene Annuity and Life Company v. SDM Holdings LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Default Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.