U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-01002
  • Case Name: Bointy v. State of Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • May 01, 2025: [In Limine]
  • May 01, 2025: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 01, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 17, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 14, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 12, 2025: [Witness List]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.