U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01000
  • Case Name: Pendergraft v. DeJoy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Address Change]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.