U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01061
  • Case Name: Williams v. LeClair
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 25, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.