U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00285-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Stephens et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver (other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 03, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss Counts]
  • March 17, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • March 17, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.