U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00488
  • Case Name: Inda v. Franklin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Intervenor Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Joint Status Report]
  • October 11, 2024: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.