U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • May 01, 2025: [Waive and File Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • May 01, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 28, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.