U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00366-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 07, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.