U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00795
  • Case Name: Segrest et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Protective Order]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Leave]
  • October 16, 2024: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.