U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00313-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gentry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 02, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Information - Felony]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.