U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01204
  • Case Name: Tourian v. Baker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Docket]
  • March 25, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 25, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: [Payment for a Civil Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.