U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01229
  • Case Name: Wilkinson et al v. Oklahoma Housing Finance Agency et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 26, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 07, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.