U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Staglin v. Trueaccord Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2025: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.