U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ballard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Appeal Transcript]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 07, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 04, 2025: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 21, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
December, 2024
  • December 19, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.