U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00481-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez-Osorio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 01, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.