U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00605
  • Case Name: Stogsdill et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
  • April 15, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 01, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
  • April 01, 2025: [Witness List]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.