U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00402
  • Case Name: Hurtt et al v. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.