U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stowers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: [Seal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.