U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-01075
  • Case Name: Walden v. The City of Duncan, Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Exclude]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 12, 2025: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • March 12, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.