U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00843
  • Case Name: Peeler v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 18, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 18, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.