U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01097
  • Case Name: Armendariz et al v. CRH Interior Design LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 04, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Docket]
  • April 02, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • April 02, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 17, 2025: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
February, 2025
  • February 17, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.