U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00314-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Biscoe et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Use 404b Evidence]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.