U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01227
  • Case Name: Forehand et al v. Ali et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.