U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00522-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noles et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Seal Document]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.